Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michele Di Ruberto

Deceased

Secretary Emeritus of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints

Titular Archbishop of Biccari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1934Born
29 Sep 195723.0Ordained PriestPriest of Lucera, Italy
30 Sep 198652.0IncardinatedPriest of Lucera-Troia, Italy
5 May 200772.6AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints
5 May 200772.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Biccari
30 Jun 200772.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Biccari
201075.3RetiredSecretary of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints
26 Apr 202590.6DiedSecretary Emeritus of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints

MicroData Summary
Michele Di Ruberto
Archbishop Michele Di Ruberto
(born , died )
Secretary Emeritus of Causes of Saints

EventPlace
Birth PlacePietra Montecorvino, Diocese of Lucera, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 67.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 May 2007
  • c2+/ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,441
  • d: CB, 26 Apr 2025

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025