Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Dragićević (Draghichevich), O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Bosnia (Ottoman)

Titular Bishop of Dium


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Dec 1740AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bosnia (Ottoman), Croatia
15 Dec 1740AppointedTitular Bishop of Dium
29 Jun 1741Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dium
30 Jun 1766ResignedVicar Apostolic of Bosnia (Ottoman), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Paul Dragićević (Draghichevich):
Bishop Paul Dragićević (Draghichevich) O.F.M. , Vicar Apostolic of Bosnia (Ottoman)

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 40
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 196

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015