Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Luis Dibildox Martínez

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tampico, Tamaulipas, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1943Born
27 Oct 196825.2Ordained PriestPriest of San Luis Potosí, México
20 Dec 199350.4AppointedBishop of Tarahumara, Chihuahua, México
25 Jan 199450.5Ordained BishopBishop of Tarahumara, Chihuahua, México
27 Dec 200360.4AppointedBishop of Tampico, Tamaulipas, México
20 Jul 201875.0RetiredBishop of Tampico, Tamaulipas, México
31 Aug 201875.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Tampico, Tamaulipas, México

MicroData Summary for José Luis Dibildox Martínez
Bishop José Luis Dibildox Martínez (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tampico

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMatehuala
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora de Guadalupe, Cathedral, Guachochi, Diocese of Tarahumara, Chihuahua
Death PlaceTampico, Diocese of Tampico, Tamaulipas
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Tampico, Diocese of Tampico, Tamaulipas

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138, Number 12,298
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Jul 2018
  • d: CB, 1 Sep 2018
  • d: CL, 3 Sep 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.0, 30 Aug 2018; Data: 5 Sep 2018

Quantcast