Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthieu Delinich, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Bolina


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Dec 1735AppointedTitular Bishop of Bolina
27 May 1736Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bolina
14 Nov 1740DiedTitular Bishop of Bolina

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Matthieu Delinich:
Bishop Matthieu Delinich O.F.M. (died ) Titular Bishop of Bolina

  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 126, and Page 454
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1736, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015