Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Antonio García Mohedano

Deceased

Bishop of Guayana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1741BornTalarrubias, Spain
11 Aug 180059.3AppointedBishop of Guayana, Venezuela
16 Aug 180160.3Ordained BishopBishop of Guayana, Venezuela
17 Oct 180463.4DiedBishop of Guayana, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for José Antonio García Mohedano:
Bishop José Antonio García Mohedano (born , died ) Bishop of Guayana

  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1801, Number 18
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 209
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 120, Number 635

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015