Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jan Benisławski

Deceased

Coadjutor Archbishop of Mohilev, Belarus

Titular Archbishop of Gadara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1735Born
1783¹47.4AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Mohilev, Belarus
1783¹47.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Gadara
8 Feb 178448.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Gadara
4 Apr 181276.7DiedCoadjutor Archbishop of Mohilev, Belarus

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Benisławski
Archbishop Jan Benisławski (born , died ) Coadjutor Archbishop of Mohilev

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLivonie

  • a bishop for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 222, and Page 293
  • bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1784, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast