Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adrian Butrymowicz, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ruthenian)

Titular Bishop of Calama


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Jan 1792AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ruthenian), Ukraine
13 Jan 1792AppointedTitular Bishop of Calama
22 Apr 1792Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Calama
29 Mar 1819DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ruthenian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Adrian Butrymowicz:
Bishop Adrian Butrymowicz O.S.B.M. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev}

  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 139, and Page 454
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,912

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 31 Mar 2014