Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Battista de Albertis

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ventimiglia

Titular Archbishop of Nazianzus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1784BornGenova
20 Sep 180622.3Ordained PriestPriest
3 Apr 183045.8SelectedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
28 Feb 183146.7ConfirmedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
15 May 183146.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
12 Nov 183652.4ResignedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
17 Dec 184056.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nazianzus
4 Jan 186277.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Ventimiglia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista de Albertis
Archbishop Giovanni Battista de Albertis (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ventimiglia

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 278, and Page 392
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1831, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Aug 2016