Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arnold Boghaert, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Roseau, Dominica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1920BornLandegem, Belgium
15 Sep 193918.9ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
18 Jun 194423.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
9 Nov 195636.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Roseau, Dominica, Antilles
9 Nov 195636.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Sufetula
25 Feb 195736.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sufetula
4 Jun 195736.6SucceededBishop of Roseau, Dominica, Antilles
29 Nov 199373.1DiedBishop of Roseau, Dominica, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Arnold Boghaert:
Bishop Arnold Boghaert C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Roseau

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 36.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013