Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Yves-Marie Croc, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Southern Tonking {Tonkino Meridionale}

Titular Bishop of Laranda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1829BornCoatréven, France
17 Dec 185324.5Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
4 Sep 186637.2AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Southern Tonking {Tonkino Meridionale}, Viet Nam
4 Sep 186637.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Laranda
7 Jun 186838.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Laranda
8 Dec 187748.4SucceededVicar Apostolic of Southern Tonking {Tonkino Meridionale}, Viet Nam
11 Oct 188556.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Southern Tonking {Tonkino Meridionale}, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Yves-Marie Croc:
Bishop Yves-Marie Croc M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Southern Tonking {Tonkino Meridionale}

  • a priest for 31.8 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 333

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013