Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignace Cotolendi, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Nanking [Nanjing], China

Titular Bishop of Metellopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1630Born
Mar 1653³22.9Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
20 Sep 166030.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nanking [Nanjing], China
20 Sep 166030.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Metellopolis
7 Nov 166030.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Metellopolis
16 Aug 166232.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Nanking [Nanjing], China

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ignace Cotolendi (VIAF: 179198442)
Bishop Ignace Cotolendi M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Nanking [Nanjing]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrignoles, Archdiocese of Aix, France
Ordained BishopParis, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Death PlacePalacot, India

  • a priest for 9.4 years
  • a bishop for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 239
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1660, Number 27
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 28 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast