Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquín González de Terán, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Albarracin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1741BornCádiz
29 Jan 180866.3SelectedBishop of Albarracin, Spain
16 Mar 180866.4ConfirmedBishop of Albarracin, Spain
15 Jan 180967.2Ordained BishopBishop of Albarracin, Spain
7 Jul 181573.7RetiredBishop of Albarracin, Spain
17 Oct 181978.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Albarracin, Spain

MicroData Summary for Joaquín González de Terán:
Bishop Joaquín González de Terán O.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Albarracin

  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 65
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,367

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013