Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Cosenza

Deceased

Bishop of Vico Equense, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1668³Born
19 Sep 169324.9Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jan 172859.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Lete
15 Feb 172859.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lete
19 Dec 173264.1AppointedBishop of Vico Equense, Italy
28 May 174374.5DiedBishop of Vico Equense, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Cosenza
Bishop Carlo Cosenza (born , died ) Bishop of Vico Equense

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStignano, Diocese of Squillace
Ordained BishopSan Domenico Maggiore, Basilica, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Death PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 243
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 440
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1728, Number 4
  • loc: AT, 26 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Jun 2018

Quantcast