Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernhard Eduard Christen, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Stauropolis

Titular See: (Bernhard of Andermatt)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1837Born
8 Oct 185619.2Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
29 Jul 186023.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
9 May 188446.7ElectedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
8 May 189658.7ElectedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
25 May 190870.8CeasedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
6 Jun 190870.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Stauropolis
14 Jun 190870.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Stauropolis
11 Mar 190971.6DiedTitular Archbishop of Stauropolis

MicroData Summary for Bernhard Eduard Christen
Archbishop Bernhard Eduard Christen O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Stauropolis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAndermatt, Switzerland

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for .7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,502
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 43
  • mige: AJ, 17 Nov 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast