Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Rafael Otón Castro y Jiménez

Deceased

Archbishop of San José de Costa Rica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1877BornSan José
28 Oct 189922.8Ordained PriestPriest of San José de Costa Rica
10 Mar 192144.2AppointedArchbishop of San José de Costa Rica
2 Aug 192144.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of San José de Costa Rica
14 Dec 193962.9DiedArchbishop of San José de Costa Rica

MicroData Summary for Rafael Otón Castro y Jiménez:
Archbishop Rafael Otón Castro y Jiménez (born , died ) Archbishop of San José de Costa Rica

  • a priest for 40.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013