Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Octavio Ortiz Arrieta, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Chachapoyas, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1878Born
27 Jan 190728.7Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
21 Nov 192143.5AppointedBishop of Chachapoyas, Peru
11 Jun 192244.1Ordained BishopBishop of Chachapoyas, Peru
1 Mar 195879.8DiedBishop of Chachapoyas, Peru

MicroData Summary for Pedro Octavio Ortiz Arrieta
Bishop Pedro Octavio Ortiz Arrieta S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Chachapoyas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 35.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • c2+: CB, 2 Oct 2007
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 34
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 123

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast