Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Marie Aubriot de la Palme

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Aosta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1752³Born
21 Dec 177624.0Ordained PriestPriest
10 Oct 181865.8SelectedBishop of Aosta, Italy
29 Mar 181966.3ConfirmedBishop of Aosta, Italy
11 Jul 181966.6Ordained BishopBishop of Aosta, Italy
30 Jul 182370.6ResignedBishop of Aosta, Italy
8 Feb 182673.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Aosta, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste-Marie Aubriot de la Palme
Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Marie Aubriot de la Palme (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Aosta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa-Motte-Monfort

  • a priest for 49.1 years
  • a bishop for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 94
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1819, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast