Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardino Giovanni Battista Bollati, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Biella, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1762Born
19 Feb 178522.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
10 Oct 181856.5SelectedBishop of Biella, Italy
21 Dec 181856.7ConfirmedBishop of Biella, Italy
3 Jan 181956.7Ordained BishopBishop of Biella, Italy
11 Jun 182866.1DiedBishop of Biella, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bernardino Giovanni Battista Bollati
Bishop Bernardino Giovanni Battista Bollati O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of Biella

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCardč, Diocese of Saluzzo
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceBiella, Diocese of Biella

  • a priest for 43.3 years
  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 120
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1819, Number 2
  • ob/c2: AT, 12 Aug 2017
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Number 19,473

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast