Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Luis Cárcamo y Rodríguez

Deceased

Bishop of San Salvador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1836BornS. Lorenzo Chalchuapa
3 Mar 186023.3Ordained PriestPriest of San Salvador, El Salvador
6 Mar 187134.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of San Salvador, El Salvador
6 Mar 187134.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Arsinoë in Cypro
5 Nov 187135.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arsinoë in Cypro
6 Aug 187538.7SucceededBishop of San Salvador, El Salvador
12 Sep 188548.8DiedBishop of San Salvador, El Salvador

MicroData Summary for José Luis Cárcamo y Rodríguez:
Bishop José Luis Cárcamo y Rodríguez (born , died ) Bishop of San Salvador

  • a priest for 25.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,728
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,030
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 124, and Page 495

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013