Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuel-François Canappe

Deceased

Bishop of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre, Guadeloupe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1849BornWailly, France
22 Dec 187223.4Ordained PriestPriest
5 Apr 190151.7SelectedBishop of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre, Guadeloupe, Antilles
18 Apr 190151.7ConfirmedBishop of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre, Guadeloupe, Antilles
25 Jul 190152.0Ordained BishopBishop of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre, Guadeloupe, Antilles
8 Nov 190152.3InstalledBishop of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre, Guadeloupe, Antilles
20 Sep 190758.2DiedBishop of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre, Guadeloupe, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel-François Canappe:
Bishop Emmanuel-François Canappe (born , died ) Bishop of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre

  • a priest for 34.7 years
  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 293
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013