Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis de Nogaret de La Valette

Deceased

Bishop of Carcassonne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1598¹BornBordeaux
28 May 162931.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Mirepoix, France
28 May 162931.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Cilicia
23 Dec 162931.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Cilicia
3 Jul 163032.5SucceededBishop of Mirepoix, France
1655²57.0ResignedBishop of Mirepoix, France
2 May 165557.3SelectedBishop of Carcassonne, France
26 Jun 165658.4ConfirmedBishop of Carcassonne, France
10 Sep 167981.6DiedBishop of Carcassonne, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis de Nogaret de La Valette:
Bishop Louis de Nogaret de La Valette (died ) Bishop of Carcassonne

  • a bishop for 49.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 245, and Page 134
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1629, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 5 Mar 2015