Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hippolyte de Béthune

Deceased

Bishop of Verdun


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1646BornBolainville
6 Sep 168034.7SelectedBishop of Verdun, France
23 Jun 168135.5ConfirmedBishop of Verdun, France
3 Aug 168135.6Ordained BishopBishop of Verdun, France
24 Aug 172074.6DiedBishop of Verdun, France

MicroData Summary for Hippolyte de Béthune:
Bishop Hippolyte de Béthune (died ) Bishop of Verdun

  • a bishop for 39.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 416

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 27 Sep 2014