Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lothar Breidbach zu Bürresheim, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Fulda

Titular Bishop of Ierichus

Titular See: (Friedrich Ignaz)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1724BornNiederholn
8 Sep 174218.0ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
9 Mar 174823.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Saint Benedict
1 Mar 174924.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
1 Jun 177853.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Fulda, Germany
1 Jun 177853.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Ierichus
29 Jun 177853.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ierichus
7 Jul 179469.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Fulda, Germany

MicroData Summary for Lothar Breidbach zu Bürresheim:
Bishop Lothar Breidbach zu Bürresheim O.S.B. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Fulda

  • a priest for 45.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1778, Number 17
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 242, and Page 452

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Dec 2015