Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Leonard Brindisi

Deceased

Archbishop of Corfù, Zante e Cefalonia, Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1854Born
1876¹21.5Ordained PriestPriest of Athēnai {Athens}, Greece
30 Mar 190954.7AppointedArchbishop of Naxos, Greece
2 May 190954.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Naxos, Greece
3 Jul 191965.0AppointedArchbishop of Corfù, Zante e Cefalonia, Greece
8 Sep 194086.2DiedArchbishop of Corfù, Zante e Cefalonia, Greece

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Leonard Brindisi
Archbishop Leonard Brindisi (born , died ) Archbishop of Corfù, Zante e Cefalonia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAthenai

  • a priest for 64.6 years
  • a bishop for 31.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1909, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast