Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kaspar von Seckendorff

Deceased

Bishop of Eichstätt, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1542Born
13 Aug 159048.0SelectedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
23 Jan 159148.5ConfirmedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
24 Dec 159250.4Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jan 159350.4Ordained BishopBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
28 Apr 159552.7DiedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany

MicroData Summary for Kaspar von Seckendorff (VIAF: 23214898)
Bishop Kaspar von Seckendorff (born , died ) Bishop of Eichstätt

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSimmelsdorf
Ordained BishopCathedral, Eichstätt, Diocese of Eichstätt

  • a priest for 2.3 years
  • a bishop for 2.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1593, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 184
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 193

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast