Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri-Ignace de Brancas

Deceased

Bishop of Lisieux, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1684¹Born
1710¹26.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Aug 171430.6SelectedBishop of Lisieux, France
19 Nov 171430.8ConfirmedBishop of Lisieux, France
13 Jan 171531.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lisieux, France
31 Mar 176076.2DiedBishop of Lisieux, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Henri-Ignace de Brancas (VIAF: 2320109)
Bishop Henri-Ignace de Brancas (born 1684, died ) Bishop of Lisieux

EventPlace
Birth PlacePernes

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 45.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 243
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1715, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast