Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Oliver Bowers, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint John’s-Basseterre, Virgin Islands (British), Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1910Born
22 Jan 193928.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
27 Nov 195242.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Accra, Ghana
27 Nov 195242.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Cyparissia
8 Jan 195342.7AppointedBishop of Accra, Ghana
22 Apr 195343.0Ordained BishopBishop of Accra, Ghana
16 Jan 197160.8AppointedBishop of Saint John’s, Virgin Islands (British), Antilles
17 Jul 198171.3RetiredBishop of Saint John’s-Basseterre, Virgin Islands (British), Antilles
6 Nov 2012102.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint John’s-Basseterre, Virgin Islands (British), Antilles

MicroData Summary for Joseph Oliver Bowers (VIAF: 171451529)
Bishop Joseph Oliver Bowers S.V.D. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint John’s-Basseterre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMahaut

  • a priest for 73.7 years
  • a bishop for 59.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018