Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giulio Cardinal Boschi

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Ferrara, Italy

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Bishop of Comacchio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1838Born
25 May 186123.2Ordained PriestPriest of Perugia, Italy
1 Jun 188850.2AppointedBishop of Todi, Italy
11 Jun 188850.2Ordained BishopBishop of Todi, Italy
29 Nov 189557.7AppointedBishop of Senigallia, Italy
19 Apr 190062.1AppointedArchbishop of Ferrara, Italy
15 Apr 190163.1Elevated to Cardinal
18 Apr 190163.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna
7 Jan 190970.8AppointedBishop of Comacchio, Italy
7 Jan 191980.8ResignedArchbishop of Ferrara, Italy
3 Jul 191981.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
15 May 192082.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Ferrara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giulio Boschi (VIAF: 88608370)
Giulio Cardinal Boschi (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Ferrara

EventPlace
Birth PlacePerugia, Archdiocese of Perugia
Ordained PriestPerugia, Archdiocese of Perugia
Ordained BishopSantissima TrinitÓ in Montecitorio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)St. Peter's Chapter Chapel, Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 31.9 years
  • a cardinal for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 270, and Page 513
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 571, and Page 46
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 49
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Apr 1901
  • c34: CB, 8 Feb 2015
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,346
  • r: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1888, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017