Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anselmo Evangelista Sansoni, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cefal¨, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1859Born
30 Oct 190747.8AppointedBishop of Cefal¨, Italy
17 Nov 190747.9Ordained BishopBishop of Cefal¨, Italy
18 Jun 192161.5DiedBishop of Cefal¨, Italy

MicroData Summary for Anselmo Evangelista Sansoni
Bishop Anselmo Evangelista Sansoni O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Cefal¨

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTerranova Bracciolini

  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,037
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1907, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast