Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Castelli

Deceased

Bishop of Rimini, Italy

Apostolic Nuncio to France


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Mar 1574AppointedBishop of Rimini, Italy
2 May 1574Ordained BishopBishop of Rimini, Italy
1 Apr 1581AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
22 Aug 1583DiedBishop of Rimini, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Castelli (VIAF: 90103279)
Bishop Giovanni Battista Castelli (died ) Bishop of Rimini

EventPlace
Ordained BishopMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 118
  • ob/c2: CB, 8 Mar 2014
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,017
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 260
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1574, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast