Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop St. Alessandro Maria Sauli, B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pavia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1534BornMilano
24 Mar 155622.1Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
10 Feb 157036.0AppointedBishop of Aleria, France
12 Mar 157036.1Ordained BishopBishop of Aleria, France
10 May 159157.2AppointedBishop of Pavia, Italy
20 Oct 159157.7InstalledBishop of Pavia, Italy
11 Oct 159258.7DiedBishop of Pavia, Italy
23 Apr 1741Beatified
11 Dec 1904Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Alessandro Maria Sauli:
Bishop St. Alessandro Maria Sauli B. (born , died ) Bishop of Pavia

  • a priest for 36.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 269, and Page 102
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,566
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013