Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea Bonito, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Capaccio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1619BornAmalfi
14 Jun 167758.5AppointedBishop of Capaccio, Italy
20 Jun 167758.5Ordained BishopBishop of Capaccio, Italy
2 Feb 168465.1DiedBishop of Capaccio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea Bonito:
Bishop Andrea Bonito C.O. (died ) Bishop of Capaccio

  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 142

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013