Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Constantine Bae Ki Hyen

Bishop of Masan, Korea (South)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1953 Born
28 Jan 198531.9Ordained PriestPriest of Masan, Korea (South)
19 Apr 201663.2AppointedBishop of Masan, Korea (South)
8 Jun 201663.3Ordained BishopBishop of Masan, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for Constantine Bae Ki Hyen
Bishop Constantine Bae Ki Hyen (born ) Bishop of Masan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMasan

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Masan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Apr 2016
  • ob: CB, 28 Apr 2016
  • c2+: CB, 8 Jun 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,934

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast