Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean Damascène Bimenyimana

Deceased

Bishop of Cyangugu, Rwanda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1953Born
6 Jul 198027.0Ordained PriestPriest of Nyundo, Rwanda
5 Nov 198128.3IncardinatedPriest of Cyangugu, Rwanda
2 Jan 199743.5AppointedBishop of Cyangugu, Rwanda
16 Mar 199743.7Ordained BishopBishop of Cyangugu, Rwanda
11 Mar 201864.7DiedBishop of Cyangugu, Rwanda

MicroData Summary for Jean Damascène Bimenyimana
Jean Damascène Bimenyimana (born , died ) Bishop of Cyangugu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShangi
Ordained BishopStade communal, Cyangugu, Diocese of Cyangugu
Death PlaceRwanda Military, Hospital, Kanombe, Archdiocese of Kigali

  • a priest for 37.6 years
  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,936
  • d: CB, 11 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast