Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Casoni

Deceased

Bishop of Borgo San Donnino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1599BornSarzana
27 Feb 165152.2AppointedBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
12 Mar 165152.2Ordained BishopBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
18 Apr 165152.3InstalledBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
22 Jul 165960.6DiedBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Casoni:
Bishop Filippo Casoni (died ) Bishop of Borgo San Donnino

  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 113, Number 692
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 124

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013