Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlo Berlingeri

Deceased

Archbishop of Santa Severina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1643¹BornCotrone
9 Dec 166825.9Ordained PriestPriest
27 Nov 167936.9AppointedArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
30 Nov 167936.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
5 Jan 171976.0DiedArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Berlingeri:
Archbishop Carlo Berlingeri (born 1643, died ) Archbishop of Santa Severina

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 39.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 355
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1679, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 16 Apr 2015