Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georges-Lazare Berger de Charancy

Deceased

Bishop of Montpellier


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1689BornAutun
8 Apr 173545.4SelectedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
27 Jun 173545.6ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
25 Sep 173545.9Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
22 Apr 173848.4SelectedBishop of Montpellier, France
3 Sep 173848.8ConfirmedBishop of Montpellier, France
14 Feb 174858.3DiedBishop of Montpellier, France

MicroData Summary for Georges-Lazare Berger de Charancy:
Bishop Georges-Lazare Berger de Charancy (born , died ) Bishop of Montpellier

  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015