Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Guy de Guérapin de Vauréal

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rennes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1688¹Born
1714¹26.0Ordained PriestPriest
8 May 173244.3SelectedBishop of Rennes, France
21 Jul 173244.5ConfirmedBishop of Rennes, France
24 Aug 173244.6Ordained BishopBishop of Rennes, France
Sep 173244.6InstalledBishop of Rennes, France
3 Mar 175971.1ResignedBishop of Rennes, France
17 Jun 176072.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Rennes, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis-Guy de Guérapin de Vauréal (VIAF: 2461450)
Bishop Louis-Guy de Guérapin de Vauréal (born 1688, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rennes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBeton Bazoches

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 354
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1732, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast