Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François de Salignac de La Mothe-Fénelon

Deceased

Bishop of Sarlat


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1607BornMassot
31 Oct 165851.4SelectedBishop of Sarlat, France
31 Mar 165951.8ConfirmedBishop of Sarlat, France
25 May 165952.0Ordained BishopBishop of Sarlat, France
1 May 168880.9DiedBishop of Sarlat, France

MicroData Summary for François de Salignac de La Mothe-Fénelon:
Bishop François de Salignac de La Mothe-Fénelon (born , died ) Bishop of Sarlat

  • a bishop for 28.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 139
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 345
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1659, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 30 Mar 2015