Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Barron

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Two Guineas and Senegambia {Guinea Superiore e Inferiore e di Sierra Leone}

Titular Bishop of Eucarpia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1801BornBallyneale, Ireland
1826¹24.5Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jan 184240.5AppointedPrefect of Two Guineas and Senegambia {Guinea Superiore e Inferiore e di Sierra Leone}, Gabon
3 Oct 184241.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Two Guineas and Senegambia {Guinea Superiore e Inferiore e di Sierra Leone}, Gabon
3 Oct 184241.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Constantina
1 Nov 184241.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Constantina
2 Mar 184442.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Eucarpia
3 Sep 184443.1ResignedVicar Apostolic of Two Guineas and Senegambia {Guinea Superiore e Inferiore e di Sierra Leone}, Gabon
12 Sep 185453.2DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Two Guineas and Senegambia {Guinea Superiore e Inferiore e di Sierra Leone}, Gabon

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Edward Barron (VIAF: 315945614)
Bishop Edward Barron (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Two Guineas and Senegambia {Guinea Superiore e Inferiore e di Sierra Leone}

  • a priest for 28.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 161, and Page 189
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1842, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 25 Nov 2016