Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico di Val Guarnera, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cefalý


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1697BornPalermo
20 Oct 172022.9Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
13 Aug 173234.7SelectedBishop of Cefalý, Italy
17 Nov 173235.0ConfirmedBishop of Cefalý, Italy
7 Dec 173235.0Ordained BishopBishop of Cefalý, Italy
2 May 175153.4DiedBishop of Cefalý, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico di Val Guarnera:
Bishop Domenico di Val Guarnera C.O. (born , died ) Bishop of Cefalý

  • a priest for 30.5 years
  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 160
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1732, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015