Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Javier Azagra Labiano

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cartagena (en España)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1923Born
23 Jul 195027.4Ordained PriestPriest
17 Jul 197047.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cartagena (en España)
17 Jul 197047.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Lacubaza
7 Oct 197047.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lacubaza
23 Sep 197855.6AppointedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
20 Feb 199875.0RetiredBishop of Cartagena (en España)
16 Nov 201491.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Cartagena (en España)

MicroData Summary for Javier Azagra Labiano
Bishop Javier Azagra Labiano (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cartagena (en España)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePamplona

  • a priest for 64.3 years
  • a bishop for 44.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 16 Nov 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast