Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domenico de’ Marini

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Teodosia


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Dec 1669AppointedTitular Archbishop of Teodosia
18 May 1670Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Teodosia
27 Apr 1676DiedTitular Archbishop of Teodosia

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Domenico de’ Marini:
Archbishop Domenico de’ Marini (died ) Titular Archbishop of Teodosia

  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 375
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1670, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 18 Apr 2015