Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Adinolfi

Deceased

Bishop of Nocera de’ Pagani


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1802BornAvellino
12 Jun 182422.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
11 Mar 182623.8Ordained PriestPriest
3 Nov 185452.5SelectedBishop of Nusco, Italy
30 Nov 185452.6ConfirmedBishop of Nusco, Italy
3 Dec 185452.6Ordained BishopBishop of Nusco, Italy
13 Mar 186057.8SelectedBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy
23 Mar 186057.9ConfirmedBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy
1863¹60.7DiedBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michele Adinolfi:
Bishop Michele Adinolfi (born ) Bishop of Nocera de’ Pagani

  • a priest for 36.8 years
  • a bishop for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1863
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 420, and Page 421

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013