Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Domingo Armestar Espinoza de los Monteros

Deceased

Bishop of Trujillo, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1790Born
19 Mar 181726.6Ordained PriestPriest
13 Nov 187484.2SelectedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
21 Dec 187484.3ConfirmedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
18 Apr 187584.6Ordained BishopBishop of Trujillo, Peru
19 May 187584.7InstalledBishop of Trujillo, Peru
14 Dec 188191.3DiedBishop of Trujillo, Peru

MicroData Summary for José Domingo Armestar Espinoza de los Monteros
Bishop José Domingo Armestar Espinoza de los Monteros (born , died ) Bishop of Trujillo

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiua
Ordained BishopSt. Dominique, Lima, Archdiocese of Lima

  • a priest for 64.7 years
  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,713
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 569
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast