Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Arce Reinoso

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Plasencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1585BornZalamea de la Serena
1 Oct 163550.4AppointedBishop of Tui, Spain
3 Feb 163650.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tui, Spain
12 Oct 163752.5SelectedBishop of Ávila, Spain
22 Mar 163852.9ConfirmedBishop of Ávila, Spain
24 Mar 164054.9SelectedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
8 Oct 164055.5ConfirmedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
10 Dec 165267.6ResignedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
18 Jul 166580.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Plasencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Diego Arce Reinoso:
Bishop Diego Arce Reinoso (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Plasencia

  • a bishop for 29.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 65, and Page 282
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 349
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,846
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 162, Number 1,022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 23 Jul 2014