Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Emanuel de Espinosa, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarragona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1597²BornSevilla
25 May 165356.4SelectedBishop of Urgell, Spain
25 Oct 165558.8ConfirmedBishop of Urgell, Spain
1660²63.0Ordained BishopBishop of Urgell, Spain
26 Nov 166366.9AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
12 Feb 167982.1DiedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Emanuel de Espinosa:
Archbishop Juan Emanuel de Espinosa O.S.B. (died ) Archbishop of Tarragona

  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 354
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 192, Number 1,205

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Nov 2013