Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dionisio Pérez Escobosa

Deceased

Bishop of Zamora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1606¹BornAlmazul
30 Jan 166357.1SelectedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
23 Apr 166357.3ConfirmedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
Jun 1663³57.4Ordained BishopBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
9 Jul 166862.5AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
1 Aug 167165.6DiedBishop of Zamora, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dionisio Pérez Escobosa:
Bishop Dionisio Pérez Escobosa (died ) Bishop of Zamora

  • a bishop for 8.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 421
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,405
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 196, Number 1,230

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Nov 2013