Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio de Estrada Manrique

Deceased

Bishop of Palencia, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Feb 1657SelectedBishop of Palencia, Spain
18 Jun 1657ConfirmedBishop of Palencia, Spain
17 Jun 1658DiedBishop of Palencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio de Estrada Manrique
Bishop Antonio de Estrada Manrique (died ) Bishop of Palencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValladolid

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,430
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 188, Number 1,181
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 271
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1657, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast