Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco de Gamboa, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Zaragoza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1599BornSan Sebastián
5 Jul 165960.3SelectedBishop of Coria, Spain
10 Nov 165960.6ConfirmedBishop of Coria, Spain
1660²60.8Ordained BishopBishop of Coria, Spain
2 Jul 166364.3AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
22 May 167475.2DiedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Gamboa:
Archbishop Francisco de Gamboa O.S.A. (born , died ) Archbishop of Zaragoza

  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 126, and Page 143
  • bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 193, Number 1,212
  • c2: CB, 21 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 23 Jul 2014